DENBIGH MUSEUM/AMGUEDDFA DINBYCH

Charity number: 1152905
Charity reporting is up to date (114 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 October 2020 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 27 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required