DENBIGH MUSEUM/AMGUEDDFA DINBYCH

Charity number: 1152905
Charity reporting is up to date (114 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £11.06k £9.67k £17.43k £8.06k £11.48k
Total expenditure £9.23k £12.93k £28.46k £10.05k £10.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.00k N/A £585