DENBIGH MUSEUM/AMGUEDDFA DINBYCH

Charity number: 1152905
Charity reporting is up to date (114 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Kerfoot Larsen Trustee 14 August 2012 None on record
Carys Harries Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
CLWYD WYNNE Trustee 28 November 2012
UNLLAIS Received: 8 days late
VALE OF CLWYD MIND ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MEDWYN FFRANCON WILLIAMS Trustee 14 August 2012 None on record
RICHARD SNELSON Trustee 16 May 2013
DENBIGH LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY [CYMDEITHAS HANES LLEOL DINBYCH] Received: On time
CYMDEITHAS CYMRU-ARIANNIN Received: On time
medwyn jones Trustee 26 June 2020
SYNOD CYMRU Received: On time
THE ROBERT DAVID HUGHES SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION Received: On time
FREEMAN EVANS ST DAVID'S DAY DENBIGH CHARITY Received: On time
David Wynn Davies Trustee 02 May 2018
NORTH WALES WILDLIFE TRUST Received: On time
Anthony Gray Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
Wendy Grey Lloyd Trustee 28 November 2012 None on record
DENBIGH TOWN COUNCIL Trustee 28 May 2014
DR EVAN PIERCE GARDENS TRUST Received: On time
Vesi Jones Trustee 28 November 2012 None on record