Accounts and annual returns 1248 Langton Association

Charity number: 1156195
Charity reporting is overdue by 613 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 248 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 248 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 613 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 613 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 June 2020 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 June 2020 488 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 June 2020 853 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required