THE FRIENDS OF HALESWORTH COUNTY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1153765
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 August 2016 On time Download