Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PEASEDOWN ST JOHN

Charity number: 1154122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Matthew Graham Street Chair 04 October 2013
BUTCOMBE AND BLAGDON YOUTH WORK TRUST
Received: On time
ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND
Received: On time
THE ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND
Recently registered
Robert Michael Goode Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Margaret Anne Coles Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Sally Cummings Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Mary Warren Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Benjamin Attenborough Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Edward Pope Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Catherine Aherne Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Jo Vening Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
Heather Mary Morgan Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
Sarah Anne Bubyer MChem Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
NIGEL PETER VENING Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
JANE STREET Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
JOY VIVIEN FRASER Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record