Financial history EASTLEIGH YOUTH & COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1154430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £285.60k £288.98k £333.51k £259.93k £322.84k
Total expenditure £301.79k £359.03k £314.54k £258.65k £315.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.88k £14.43k £4.40k £44.29k £17.58k