Accounts and annual returns GERALDINE CONNOR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156982
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window