CADE PAVILION, ELTISLEY

Charity number: 1153931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
12/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £45.05k £19.96k £14.95k £24.23k £23.04k
Total expenditure £18.19k £16.30k £8.65k £21.58k £21.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A