CADE PAVILION, ELTISLEY

Charity number: 1153931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Ridge Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
VIC HALL Trustee 24 September 2013 None on record
Sandra Anne Sills Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
ANGELA WELDON Trustee 24 September 2013 None on record
Andrew Howell Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
JULIE HERRING Chair 24 September 2013 None on record
MARTIN KAMPER Trustee 10 July 2013 None on record
James Michael Booth Trustee 02 April 2014 None on record
MARY ROSE FLINDERS Trustee 20 May 2015 None on record
MR JOHN PETTIFOR Trustee 10 July 2013
THE COVERDALE TRUST - SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN ARTISTS INTERNATIONALLY Received: On time
Beverley Stephenson Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
GRAHAM SILLS Trustee 24 September 2013 None on record
CHRIS FLINDERS Trustee 24 September 2013 None on record