Trustees THE PRINCESS PROJECT

Charity number: 1155021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Negus Chair 12 July 2016
None on record
Jordan Marie Simmons Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Bobbi Ezeike Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
STEPHEN MICHAEL RING Trustee 15 June 2020
HOWARD DE WALDEN HOSTEL CHARITY
Received: On time
Angela Trigg Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Helen Mary Williamson Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Rev Philip Goodey Trustee 27 May 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA
Received: 100 days late