Financial history RELEASE FINANCIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1155290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £40.42k £50.42k £36.52k £146.64k £89.73k
Total expenditure £39.99k £36.19k £52.74k £80.42k £82.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.32k N/A £5.00k £58.59k £30.64k