EAST GRINSTEAD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154256
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mandy Cunningham Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Karen West Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
Andrew Smith Chair 21 November 2017 None on record
Tony Cox Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
CLIVE WILLS Trustee 08 October 2014
THE ALVOR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time