Trustees YELABUS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1153996
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dennis Champney | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Bartholomew Hill | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WHITBREAD | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tony Spencer | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILL HENNELL | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN AYRES | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.