Trustees UBS UK Donor-Advised Foundation

Charity number: 1153551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Donatelli Trustee 07 February 2023
None on record
Christopher Richard Oliver Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Ebru Ozsezgin Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
RICHARD WILLIAM JOHN HARDIE Trustee 08 July 2021
SPEAK TO THE FUTURE LIMITED
Overdue by 227 days
ANDREW ELLIOT Trustee 06 October 2020
NON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
William Day Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Alexandra Dorothy Deane Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Dr Anna Magdalena Pauline Haslinger Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
NICHOLAS WRIGHT Trustee 25 July 2013
None on record