BRIGHT LIGHTS PROJECTS

Charity number: 1153637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £68.41k £131.90k £75.87k £98.33k £99.61k
Total expenditure £3.40k £106.96k £4.26k £58.13k £86.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A