SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1154806
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time Download