SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1154806
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £94.45k £85.81k £196.81k £110.58k £102.00k
Total expenditure £100.76k £108.00k £118.00k £119.05k £153.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A