HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1153641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.61k £4.10k £5.52k £6.07k £449
Total expenditure £4.54k £3.52k £4.21k £5.94k £1.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A