NORTH LONDON WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 15 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 06 March 2017 On time Download