Friends of Five Acre Wood and Grow 19

Charity number: 1153151
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 07 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 07 April 2016 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)