AGENDER EDUCATION

Charity number: 1155447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tanya Vice Trustee 23 January 2015 None on record
Kendall Beaudry Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
Ola Janowicz Trustee 17 January 2017 None on record
Dr Paula Radice Trustee 08 March 2018 None on record
Emma Insley Chair 03 June 2015 None on record