Trustees LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM

Charity number: 1158175
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIDGIT SAM-BAILEY Chair 24 October 2013
None on record
Peter Redfarn Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
Bridget Scholastica Unegbu Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
Jean Goodison Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
Fr Henry Anthony Atherton Trustee 27 November 2019
LEWISHAM CHURCHES CARE
Received: On time
Kelvin Wheelan Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Nwawudu Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
PAUL GEORGE BROWNLOW Trustee 24 October 2013
None on record
MRS STELLA AMAGBOKPA -NORTEY Trustee 24 October 2013
None on record