ACTIVE IN DEVELOPMENT AID (ADA)

Charity number: 1155709
Charity reporting is overdue by 1634 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 539 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 539 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 904 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 904 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1269 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1269 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1634 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1634 days