THE SHERIFF CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1155848
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 November 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required