Financial history AFC WIMBLEDON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £207.20k £281.92k £366.98k £847.18k £994.41k
Total expenditure £178.46k £237.77k £337.74k £630.13k £850.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.00k £4.80k £101.24k £84.80k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £358.24k £313.06k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £56.01k £99.58k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £432.88k £581.63k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5 £136
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £629.06k £785.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.07k £65.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £8.63k £8.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0