Trustees AFC WIMBLEDON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Lonsdale Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Michele Marie Little Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Claire Barclay Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Dr Mohan Sekeram Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Matt Guest Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Peter Aves Trustee 14 March 2022
None on record
Jennifer Anne Scott Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Alexander Thomas Mitchell Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
KAREN PECK Trustee 24 February 2017
None on record
NIGEL MARCELLUS HIGGS Trustee 15 August 2013
None on record