Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WITH ST LUKE, NEWPORT PAGNELL

Charity number: 1153668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £112.46k £118.78k £155.56k £177.66k £106.44k
Total expenditure £281.04k £189.44k £173.14k £163.91k £171.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A