WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1153762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.28m £140.00k £551.00k £1.57m £4.22m
Total expenditure £695.00k £424.00k £2.76m £2.72m £2.88m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.17m N/A £0 £0 £2.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £458.00k £1.46m £2.04m
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £112.00k N/A £93.00k £107.00k £97.00k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £1.76m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £640.00k N/A £2.76m £2.72m £2.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £52.00k N/A £411.00k £362.00k £380.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £40.00k £96.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0