Accounts and annual returns INDUS HEALTH NETWORK

Charity number: 1154809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window