1ST MOLESCROFT SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504085
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £8.50k
Other income £11.72k £7.33k £7.02k £9.60k £7.18k
Total expenditure £10.59k £8.11k £6.12k £10.15k £16.48k