THE JACKSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157548
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £16.34k £16.39k £5.31k £8.75k £6.31k
Total expenditure £14.46k £13.62k £10.25k £10.32k £5.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A