CAMBRIAN HOUSING SERVICES (WIRRAL) LIMITED

Charity number: 1155545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download