Dogfen lywodraethu THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOUSE OF PRAYER FOR ALL NATIONS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/02/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH (ATTACHED) IN LONDON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.