Trustees COMMUNITY EMERGENCY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH JANE MARTINEAU Chair 01 September 2022
THE NICHOLAS JOHN TRUST
Overdue by 266 days
Michael Crofton-Briggs Trustee 05 February 2024
OPPORTUNITY INTERNATIONAL UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
CLARE HAYNS Trustee 01 October 2023
THE THOMAS BENYON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: 17 days late
Judith Laura Banks Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rebecca Ekins Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Adrian Donald White Trustee 20 August 2021
None on record
Claire Lewis Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record