HOME-START SURREY

Charity number: 1154913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £405.56k £405.00k £390.89k £325.00k £282.70k
Total expenditure £411.87k £411.87k £388.98k £323.72k £284.65k
Income from government contracts £389.60k £389.60k £389.60k £325.00k £282.70k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A