HOME-START SURREY

Charity number: 1154913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Kent Chair 27 June 2016 None on record
Kathy Clark Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Stephanie Limond Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
VIVIAN CLARE WILLIAMS Trustee 21 September 2020
HOME-START SPELTHORNE Received: On time
ALAN THOMPSON Trustee 16 November 2015
FARNHAM BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
HUGH FREDERICK SHANKS Trustee 20 October 2014
FRIENDS OF WEST CLANDON CHURCH CIO Received: 7 days late
JANICE BIBBY Trustee 19 October 2015
HOME - START RUNNYMEDE AND WOKING Received: On time
BRIONY THOMAS Trustee 21 September 2017
HOME-START EPSOM, EWELL & BANSTEAD Received: On time
REFUGEE AND MIGRANT NETWORK SUTTON Received: On time
ROSALYN MOLLY MCGIBBON Trustee 20 October 2014 None on record