CHESIL SAILABILITY

Charity number: 1154416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kirsty Lydeard Trustee 30 June 2014 None on record
Shaun Carl Kerrigan Trustee 15 July 2017 None on record
Robert Uwin Lydeard Trustee 15 July 2017
WEYMOUTH ROWING CLUB Received: On time
Louis Gale Trustee 28 July 2020 None on record
HUGH DE IONGH Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
Michael Clarkson Trustee 02 June 2014 None on record
David Griffith Chair 16 February 2017 None on record
PHILIP HALL Trustee 16 October 2013
HANSA CLASS UK Received: On time