SOLID ROCK MINISTRIES LONDON, UK

Charity number: 1157810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.32k £11.34k £11.55k £6.44k £8.61k
Total expenditure £20.52k £7.91k £5.77k £6.18k £5.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A