GRACELIFE LONDON

Charity number: 1155683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £245.40k £212.04k £202.35k £327.23k £278.04k
Total expenditure £157.90k £202.16k £245.44k £275.16k £330.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A