Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TOLLESHUNT KNIGHTS WITH TIPTREE

Charity number: 1154944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND ANNE-MARIE LOUISE RENSHAW Chair 29 November 2013
TIPTREE YOUTH PROJECT OUTREACH
Received: On time
ANTHONY ABDY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Jennifer Ruth Cass Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Eric Brian Wilson Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Sheila Ann Gunson Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
MICHAEL PUTTICK Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
Richard Anthony Reynolds Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
Alison Julia Weston Trustee 13 March 2016
None on record
Paul John Green Trustee 13 March 2016
None on record
WENDY JAYNE BORGARTZ Trustee 13 March 2016
None on record
PAULINE ANN SWINDLE RGN DN Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
Mrs Penni Vigar Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
Ian Calvert Trustee 25 June 2014
None on record
DR HAROLD CHARLES TOMS PHD MRSC Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record
MARTIN DAVID BORGARTZ FCCA Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record
CLIVE REGINALD EASTBROOK Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record