TAROE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1156390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time Download