BRIDLINGTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 504167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 October 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required