MUSLIM TRUST AL-AALAMI

Charity number: 1157098
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £27.45k £5.63k £16.19k £870 £0
Total expenditure £27.07k £0 £20.25k £5.29k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A