OUSE VALLEY CYCLE NETWORK PROJECT

Charity number: 1155182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr NEVILLE WALTER HARRISON MD BS FRCS Chair 04 December 2013 None on record
Joseph Dermott Attwood Trustee 10 June 2019 None on record
SUSAN ANN THOMPSON BA Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
Dr Richard Anthony Ross Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
MICHAEL LONG Trustee 29 April 2016 None on record
SUSANNE WYLDE MA Trustee 24 November 2021
KINGSTON (LEWES) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
WENDY ANNE BREWER BA MBA Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record