Financial history EVANGELICAL PRESS MISSIONARY TRUST

Charity number: 1154646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £69.50k £117.01k £94.27k £84.84k £97.42k
Total expenditure £139.73k £110.16k £100.95k £99.78k £106.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A