ELSTREE & BOREHAMWOOD MUSEUM

Charity number: 1157770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.74k £15.38k £17.57k £14.21k £12.68k
Total expenditure £13.06k £14.84k £16.30k £12.65k £11.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £10.50k £10.50k £11.55k £11.90k