Trustees THE VTCT FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1155360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSANNA PRESTON | Chair | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Associate Professor Stephen Robert Felix Twigg | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Pleat | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Maria CROSS-DURRANT | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Nichola Jane Rumsey OBE | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Lau Walker CBE | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.