Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY SELF BUILD AGENCY

Charity number: 1155575
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 November 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2020 109 days late
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time