1ST CHASE TERRACE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR PETE FARMER Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE BROWN Trustee None on record
LUCY WELCH Trustee 09 January 2013 None on record
Phil Wall Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Kim Hillman Trustee 07 May 2021 None on record
Elaine Witcomb Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Alan Yates-Boonham Trustee 01 January 1985 None on record
MICHAEL HEATHCOTE Trustee None on record
Darren Lennon Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Brian Birch Trustee 01 January 1980 None on record
Paul Treadwell Trustee 01 January 2000 None on record
ANNE PEMBERTON-SMITH Chair 09 January 2013 None on record
Lee Welch Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record